DISABILITY REDBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Encourages and supports disabled people of all ages and backgrounds to fully participate in society. Provides a shopmobility service for those with mobility problems Gives advice and information on disability services and seeks to ensure people are aware of their rights and responsibilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Redbridge
Governance
- 08 November 1995: Standard registration
- ILFORD SHOPMOBILITY (Working name)
- REDA (Working name)
- REDBRIDGE DISABILITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE DURDLE | Trustee | 07 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
PRANJAL KAKSHEPATI | Trustee | 02 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANN KATHLEEN GARRARD | Trustee |
|
||||||
Lisa Cain | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.24k | £4 | £1.58k | £3.07k | £1.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.59k | £2.09k | £2.25k | £3.18k | £3.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 18TH JANUARY 1994. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24TH JULY 1995 AND 14TH JULY 1997 MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/07/2011
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF RELIEF FOR DISABLED PEOPLE LIVING IN,WORKING IN OR ASSOCIATED WITH THAT AREA KNOWN AS THE LONDON BOROUGH OF REDBRIDGE (HEREINAFTER KNOWN AS REDBRIDGE ) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND ASSISTANCE TO SUCH PEOPLE. (2)THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AMONGST PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL OR SENSORY DISABILITIES WORKING IN OR ASSOCIATED WITH REDBRIDGE. (3)TO FULFIL ANY OTHER OBJECT WHICH IS DEEMED WHOLLY AND EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE BY THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF REDBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ILFORD SHOPMOBILITY
CAR PARK LEVEL 1
THE EXCHANGE
HIGH ROAD
ILFORD
IG1 1RS
- Phone:
- 02084786864
- Email:
- ilfordshopmobility@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window