Accounts and annual returns THE CONSORT OF MUSICKE

Charity number: 1050356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 01 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 01 November 2024 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 01 November 2024 551 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 18 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 February 2022 294 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required