THE RCJ AND ISLINGTON CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX

Charity number: 1050358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROMOTING ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS & DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION,FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE HAVING BUSINESS AT ROYAL COURTS OF JUSTICE AND OTHERS LIVING OR WORKING THROUGHOUT ENGLAND & WALES , IN PARTICULAR IN THE LB OF ISLINGTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 November 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • RCJ ADVICE BUREAU (Working name)
  • THE RCJ CITIZENS ADVICE BUREA (Previous name)
  • THE RCJ CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Right Hon Lord Justice Peter Jackson Chair 06 November 2018
None on record
Susan Leonora Labinjoh Trustee 06 November 2024
None on record
Olivia Jane Loxley Trustee 06 November 2024
None on record
Damien Byrne Hill Trustee 30 July 2024
None on record
Saaman Pourghadiri-Esfahani Trustee 28 October 2020
None on record
Andrew Laurence Denny Trustee 03 February 2020
None on record
Guy Jeffrey Pendell Trustee 24 July 2019
None on record
Holly Ware Trustee 01 May 2019
None on record
Jon Gale Trustee 06 November 2018
None on record
Patrick William Robinson Trustee 09 November 2016
THE TOM AP RHYS PRYCE MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
Christine Howard Trustee 25 November 2013
None on record
ROGER GEORGE LEESE Trustee 26 January 2012
ADVOCATES FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Received: On time
ALEXANDER STEVENS CARRUTHERS Trustee 26 January 2012
None on record
NICHOLAS MARK ATKINS Trustee 21 October 2003
None on record
ALI SALLAWAY Trustee
None on record
GRAHAM PAUL KINGSBY HUNTLEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.19m £3.39m £3.32m £4.09m £4.10m
Total expenditure £3.03m £3.56m £3.24m £3.47m £4.07m
Income from government contracts £345.09k £289.51k £292.03k £334.92k £171.97k
Income from government grants £1.84m £1.96m £2.06m £2.79m £2.93m
Income - Donations and legacies £48.89k £175.83k £89.61k £211.84k £264.53k
Income - Other trading activities £242 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.14m £3.21m £3.23m £3.88m £3.83m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.53k £306 £65 £2.65k £7.16k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.03m £3.55m £3.24m £3.47m £4.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £176 £1.03k £356 £737 £509
Expenditure - Governance £15.32k £29.80k £15.42k £21.16k £49.17k
Expenditure - Grants institution £6.00k £4.00k £26.00k £343.20k £1.07m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £74.38k £59.55k £30.08k £6.92k £4.80k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.21m £1.13m £1.11m £1.73m £1.89m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £343.26k £417.85k £299.34k £266.64k £393.27k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 03 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ROYAL COURTS OF JUSTICE
STRAND
LONDON
WC2A 2LL
Phone:
020 3475 4373