Financial history BILLERICAY ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1050363
Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 10/04/2020 10/04/2021 10/04/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £80.42k £571 £2.50k £147.76k £123.24k
Total expenditure £93.54k £7.78k £4.89k £94.13k £111.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A