BILLERICAY ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Round Table is about having fun with a great bunch of mates & supporting local communities. UK Round Table clubs raise over ?3.3 million a year for local charities & good causes through various events including bonfire nights, beer festivals & Santa sleigh collections. Our clubs are open to men aged 18-45 & offers so many benefits. Based in Billericay Essex, please follow us online, FB & Twitter
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 02 November 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Tilley | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Roberts Sebastian | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/04/2020 | 10/04/2021 | 10/04/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.42k | £571 | £2.50k | £147.76k | £123.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.54k | £7.78k | £4.89k | £94.13k | £111.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 March 2025 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 March 2025 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 March 2025 | 397 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 March 2025 | 397 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 April 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 April 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH APRIL 1995
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES HEREBY DECLARE THAT THEY SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE SAME OR ANY PART OR PARTS THEREOF AND THE INCOME ARISING THEREFROM OR ANY PART OR PARTS THEREOF FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN THE COMMUNITY AND OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE BODIES TRUSTS, ASSOCIATIONS, INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS AFORESAID AND IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNERS AS THE CLUB IN ORDINARY MEETING SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION OR SELECT. THE CLUB SHALL COMMUNICATE SUCH DETERMINATION OR SELECTION TO THE TRUSTEES IN WRITING.
Area of benefit
BILLERICAY,ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
BILLERICAY ROUND TABLE c/o BBW CVS
The George Hurd Centre
Audley Way
BASILDON
Essex
SS14 2FL
- Phone:
- 01277623155
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window