HIGHBRIDGE COMMUNITY HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities include the hiring and letting of the hall to the public and other interested parties. Fund raising by various events for the upkeep and improvement of hall facilities.Community use for clubs and social activities. Enabling users to lead a fully active and healthy lifestyle.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Somerset
- Somerset
Governance
- 03 November 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Woodsford | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adele Marie Stevens | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Coull | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nadia McDevitt | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANET ANITA KEEN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.12k | £18.99k | £22.64k | £24.70k | £20.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.88k | £20.12k | £20.54k | £12.93k | £16.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £17.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 March 2021 | 262 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A COMMUNITY HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF HIGHBRIDGE, SOMERSET AND SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING THE USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
HIGHBRIDGE, SOMERSET AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 FAIRFORD CLOSE
HIGHBRIDGE
TA9 3JN
- Phone:
- 01278785427
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window