TIP TOP AMATEUR PRODUCTIONS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Theatre Company
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Flintshire
- Wrexham
Governance
- 06 November 1995: Standard registration
- 26 November 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 26 November 2017: Funds transferred to 1165991 TIP TOP MUSICALS LTD
- TIP TOP PRODUCTIONS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.49k | £147.74k | £170.88k | £164.05k | £129.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.70k | £154.36k | £153.21k | £131.60k | £128.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 01 July 2017 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2016
(These accounts |
01 July 2017 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 31 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 31 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 18 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2014
(These accounts |
18 February 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ART OF DRAMA, MUSIC AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ART
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED-IN PRACTICE CHESTER AND WREXHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window