Financial history WYMONDHAM LIONS INTERNATIONAL CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1050430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.13k £183 £3.23k £7.42k £7.99k
Total expenditure £4.44k £1.13k £3.13k £5.65k £8.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A