Financial history Parents and Friends of Oaklands Infant School

Charity Number: 1050445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.40k £7.68k £9.69k £12.89k £13.21k
Total expenditure £14.43k £11.91k £8.02k £24.95k £10.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A