Financial history EMMANUEL CHURCH

Charity Number: 1050448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £33.90k £13.16k £6.54k £2.09k £0
Total expenditure £46.14k £11.90k £8.65k £9.31k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A