Financial history DIGBY STUART COLLEGE

Charity number: 1050470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £30.79k £31.69k £32.03k £32.52k £33.05k
Total expenditure £37.81k £32.80k £12.13k £3.30k £27.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A