KENT OPERA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Transforming lives through music and drama . . . This former opera company now helps the rehabilitation of ex-offenders and the socially excluded through the performing arts, including the advancement of young actors and performers, in Kent and the London area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 November 1995: Standard registration
- CANTABILE TRUST (Working name)
- OPERA PLAYERS (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann-Marie Willison Nurse | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon King | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert David Weston Lacey | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.92k | £4.92k | £6.55k | £4.85k | £13.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.84k | £5.02k | £6.50k | £4.29k | £5.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 SEP 1994 AS AMENDED ON 31 OCT 1995 AS AMENDED ON 17 JUN 2004 AS AMENDED ON 26 APR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 01 AUG 2016 as amended on 24 May 2021
Charitable objects
(1) To advance the education and the development of young professional performers in opera, drama and the creative arts through working alongside and sharing their practice with the disadvantaged and *socially excluded in workshops, live performances and online. (2) To promote social inclusion for the public benefit through the provision of our projects of music and/or drama designed to help develop skills and self-confidence, with the aim of assisting integration into society and in particular into education, training and employment. (3) To promote, where feasible, the rehabilitation of prisoners for the public benefit in particular, but not exclusively, by delivering our music and/or drama projects inside and outside prisons as a means to build the skills and capacity of offenders so that they can break the cycle of reoffending. * ‘Socially excluded’ means being excluded from society, or parts of society, as a result of one of more of the following factors: Unemployment; financial hardship; youth or old age; ill health (physical or mental); substance abuse or dependency including alcohol and drugs; poor educational or skills attainment; relationship and family breakdown; poor housing; crime (either as a victim of crime or as an offender rehabilitating into society).
Area of benefit
PRIMARILY IN THE MEDWAY TOWNS, KENT AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
6th Floor
International House
Canterbury Crescent
London
SW9 7QH
- Phone:
- 07903 692765
- Email:
- info@kentopera.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window