Awaken House of Prayer

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a Christian witness to the community and surrounding area. To provide a place of worship, fellowship and teaching the Christian faith. to support directly and indirectly the proclamation of the good news at home and abroad. The charity is organised as an independant association, but it is a member of 'Assemblies of God incorperated. activities include the provision of regular service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bridgend
- Caerphilly
- Cardiff
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 09 November 1995: Standard registration
- HILLS COMMUNITY CHURCH ABERBARGOED (Previous name)
- RUHAMAH PENTECOSTAL CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy John Oliver | Chair | 19 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Brown | Trustee | 19 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Allen | Trustee | 19 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Hannah Louise Price | Trustee | 19 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Hoskins | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Angela Adams | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr PHILIP DUDLEY BROWN Doctor | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.76k | £10.15k | £14.28k | £27.25k | £20.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.17k | £12.78k | £14.04k | £6.18k | £42.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 OCTOBER 1993 as amended on 25 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD
Area of benefit
MID GLAMORGAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Gwerthonor Place
Gilfach
Bargoed
CF81 8JQ
- Phone:
- 01633619568
- Website:
-
hillscommunitychurch.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window