THE AMBER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity helps blind or partially sighted children, including those with additional disabilities, who have a talent or a love for music. The AMBER Music Awards were established to enable these children to nurture this talent by accessing the music that can transform their lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 November 1995: Standard registration
- 04 November 2019: Funds received from 1121498 PETERSHAM FESTIVAL
- ACCESS TO MUSIC FOR BLIND PEOPLE EDUCATION AND RESIDENTIAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR GEORGE ADAM OCKELFORD | Chair | 01 July 2007 |
|
|||||||
Kimberley Smith | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
HHJ Charles Atkins | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
ChunWai Shum | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Veronica Ruth Gould | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ekenta Nimi Victoria Oruwari | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Angelica Maria Lee Bomford | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
SIMON ROBERT VINCENT | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|||||||
ANN FIONA COSTA | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £329.40k | £399.88k | £299.72k | £349.00k | £314.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £338.94k | £266.67k | £304.50k | £401.22k | £540.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 25 OCTOBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 DEC 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 OCT 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND WELL-BEING OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, INCLUDING THOSE WITH ADDITIONAL DISABILITIES, TO SUPPORT AND ENHANCE THEIR LIVES, INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) THROUGH SUPPORTING THEIR ENGAGEMENT WITH MUSIC, PROMOTING HIGH QUALITY MUSIC PROVISION FOR THEM AND UNDERTAKING OR SUPPORTING RELEVANT RESEARCH. NOTHING IN THE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
64A PRINCES WAY
LONDON
SW19 6JF
- Phone:
- 03003239964
- Email:
- contact@ambertrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window