Financial history HMDT Music

Charity number: 1050520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £641.87k £529.45k £614.52k £497.59k £618.24k
Total expenditure £553.78k £580.25k £540.32k £540.88k £549.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.75k £6.96k £2.75k £1.89k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £406.86k £337.39k £347.40k N/A £15.76k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £235.01k £192.06k £267.12k N/A £602.21k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £5 N/A £262
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £519.80k £546.96k £511.19k N/A £534.74k
Expenditure - Raising funds £33.98k £33.29k £29.13k N/A £14.58k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £9.51k N/A £14.08k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0