Trustees LEWISHAM AND GREENWICH NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND
Charity number: 1050522

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Bell | Chair | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Evens | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna King | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Pui-Ling Li | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vanessa Purday | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Navnit Chana | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Godfrey Allen | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Crosby | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Spencer Prosser | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
BEN TRAVIS | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Harry Bright | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.