Financial history RAMOTH CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity Number: 1050530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.32k £30.40k £30.29k £27.93k £26.90k
Total expenditure £22.73k £28.53k £20.54k £12.67k £12.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £540