HAIG PIT RESTORATION GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 November 1995: Standard registration
- 27 March 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 27 March 2006: Funds transferred to 1103729 HAIG COLLIERY MINING MUSEUM
- HAIG COLLIERY MINING MUSEUM (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | 09 March 2006 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2004 | 09 March 2005 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2004 | 09 March 2005 | 9 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 JULY 1995 AS AMENDED 14 OCTOBER 1995 AND 11 JANUARY 1997.
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE MINING HISTORY OF CUMBRIA, IN PARTICULAR, COAL MINING IN WEST CUMBRIA BY MAINTAINING A MUSEUM FOR THE EXHIBITION OF TOOLS, MACHINERY, GEOLOGICAL SPECIMENS, RECORDS, PHOTOGRAPHS AND ARCHIVES AND BY DEMONSTRATION OF PAST AND CONTEMPORARY MINING METHODS. B. TO EXPLORE RESEARCH AND PRESERVE SUCH OF THE HISTORIC MINING REMAINS AND RELATED INDUSTRIAL WORKINGS AS MAY ASSIST IN THE COUNTRY OF CUMBRIA AND ELSEWHERE
Area of benefit
CUMBRIA AND NATIONALLY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window