Financial history BISPHAM PARISH MISSION

Charity number: 1050535
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £3.44k £3.76k £2.05k £2.80k £26.67k
Total expenditure £756 £0 £100 £30 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A