CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE ROYAL MARSDEN HOSPITAL NHS TRUST

Charity number: 1050537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

On 1 September 2011 the Charity transferred its assets, liabilities and functions to the Royal Marsden Cancer Charity (RMCC), an independent charity (Reg: 1095197) with similar aims and objectives, encompassing charitable purposes in connection with The Royal Marsden Hospital. Under a Deed of Covenant the Charity now transfers all income received to RMCC.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 January 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE ROYAL MARSDEN HOSPITAL CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE ROYAL MARSDEN NHS FOUNDATION TRUST Trustee
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME SEALED 29 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO COMBINE THE INVESTMENTS AND MONEYS BELONGING TO THE CHARITIES AND REPRESENTING EXPENDABLE FUNDS INTO ONE POOLED FUND
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 08 January 2002 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
ROYAL MARSDEN HOSPITAL
FULHAM ROAD
LONDON
SW3 6JJ
Phone:
020 7808 2233