Financial history Fochriw Pentecostal Mission

Charity number: 1050539
Charity reporting is up to date (62 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £15.88k £16.46k £53.72k £26.22k £20.15k
Total expenditure £30.15k £7.75k £56.75k £27.18k £5.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.65k N/A N/A