LAWRENNY YOUTH HOSTEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of youth hostel facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £23,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 10 November 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D J O S LORT PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Richard Daniel Price Lewis | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.64k | £9.59k | £10.77k | £11.53k | £23.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.13k | £10.86k | £13.02k | £10.07k | £13.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £11.53k | £23.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 411 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AMONG THE PUBLIC ESPECIALLY YOUNG PERSONS OF LIMITED MEANS EDUCATION IN AND CARE AND CONCERN FOR THE COUNTRYSIDE BY MEANS OF THE PROVISION OF YOUTH HOSTEL ACCOMODATION IN THE VILLAGE OF LAWRENNY
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE VILLAGE OF LAWRENNY
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Victoria Place
Haverfordwest
SA61 2LP
- Phone:
- 01437764593
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window