KADAMPA MEDITATION CENTRE (KMC) SOUTHAMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teaching Buddhism and meditation classes, running retreats. Holding study programmes and selling Buddhist literature. Holding fund-raising and community building events. School visits and university talks. Giving support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
- West Sussex
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 13 November 1995: Standard registration
- THEKCHEN BUDDHIST CENTRE (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Hunt | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Mary Estelle Cansdale | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|||||||
Ben Gallagher | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.19k | £133.96k | £79.78k | £144.53k | £167.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.25k | £106.82k | £88.24k | £139.64k | £155.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £39.86k | £12.77k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 APR 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 JUN 2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 MAR 2016 as amended on 30 Nov 2020 as amended on 30 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BUDDHIST FAITH UNDER THE SPIRITUAL GUIDANCE OF THE ELECTED GENERAL SPIRITUAL DIRECTOR OF THE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION - INTERNATIONAL KADAMPA BUDDHIST UNION PRINCIPALLY THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF TEACHING, STUDY, PRACTICE AND THE OBSERVANCE OF MORAL DISCIPLINE ALL WITHIN THE MAHAYANA BUDDHIST TRADITION OF ATISHA AND JE TSONGKHAPA AS TAUGHT BY VENERABLE GESHE KELSANG GYATSO, THE FOUNDER OF THE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION - INTERNATIONAL KADAMPA BUDDHIST UNION THROUGH THE CONTINUOUS IMPLEMENTATION OF THE THREE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION STUDY PROGRAMMES - THE GENERAL PROGRAMME, THE FOUNDATION PROGRAMME AND THE TEACHER TRAINING PROGRAMME
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
21-22 Hanover Buildings
SOUTHAMPTON
SO14 1JU
- Phone:
- 02380 482696
- Email:
- ad.kmcsouthampton@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window