DISCOVERY CHURCH SWINDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a pentecostal church that exists to promote and advance the Christian faith primarily in the Swindon area. We focus on helping people to build a relationship with Jesus Christ. We demonstrate God's love by engaging with our community through various practical activities such as parent & toddler groups etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Swindon
Governance
- 13 November 1995: Standard registration
- WROUGHTON ASSEMBLIES OF GOD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THOMAS PAUL PRICE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gentian Mullaliu | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Diane Perrott | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.89k | £180.22k | £177.57k | £174.39k | £126.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £221.30k | £256.24k | £185.69k | £166.67k | £162.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 232 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 232 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 08 September 2024 | 344 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 08 September 2024 | 344 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND TRUST DEED ADOPTED 15 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE SWINDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Discovery Church
1 Lagos Street
SWINDON
SN1 2BU
- Phone:
- 07555029913
- Email:
- pastortom@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window