NEW LIFE CHRISTIAN CHURCH (WESTERN VALLEY )IN FELLOWSHIP WITH ASSEMBLIES OF GOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities of the charity are to provide an opportunity for people to engage in Christianity fellowship, teaching and services. Also to interact with the community to express compassion and actively display the faith of the Church with acts of kindness. To help and assist one another.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £34,303 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 13 November 1995: Standard registration
- NEW LIFE (Working name)
- NLCC (Working name)
- FULL GOSPEL MISSION (Previous name)
- NEW LIFE CHRISTIAN CHURCH (WESTERN VALLEY) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAYDN JEFFERIES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Carl Andrew Matthews | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Haines | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.80k | £32.03k | £30.27k | £91.61k | £71.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.60k | £32.14k | £20.34k | £61.56k | £91.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.17k | £6.59k | N/A | £61.27k | £34.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2021
(These accounts |
03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JUNE 1993 AS AMENDED BY BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 27 SEPTEMBER 2007 TO ADOPT MODEL CONSTITUTION WITH TRUST DEED FOR LOCAL ASSEMBLIES OF GOD
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; B)TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE ABERCARN
Contact information
- Address:
-
New Life Christian Church
37 Llanover Street
Abercarn
NEWPORT
NP11 4SX
- Phone:
- 07949220135
- Email:
- newlifecc@talktalk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window