OAKDALE CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting Christian values among young children and teenagers, also serving the elderly in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 13 November 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID NICHOLAS JENKINS | Chair |
|
||||
Timothy Paul Jenkins | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|||
Reginald Gordon Onions | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.00k | £42.00k | £47.00k | £52.78k | £47.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.00k | £40.00k | £41.00k | £68.48k | £52.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE OAKDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 THE ELMS
OAKDALE
BLACKWOOD
NP12 0EP
- Phone:
- 01495244754
- Email:
- jenkins77@talktalk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window