FRIENDS OF BRAMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the Friends of Brampton Association are to advance the education and well being of the students at the school by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities and services for education at the school. This is through fund raising and activities throughout the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Bexley
- Kent
Governance
- 15 November 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Goldsmith | Chair | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alex Brook | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie-Ann Elizabeth Wilkinson | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Allen | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.25k | £10.99k | £30.68k | £29.05k | £28.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.90k | £10.48k | £20.00k | £45.32k | £22.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MARCH 1995, AS AMENDED 27 SEPTEMBER 2005 AND 26 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN BRAMPTON PRIMARY SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brampton Primary Academy
Brampton Road
BEXLEYHEATH
Kent
DA7 4SL
- Phone:
- 02083032873
- Email:
- fob.treasurer@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window