THE MANCHESTER CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
INCREASING AWARENESS OF THE HERITAGE AND CHARACTER OF MANCHESTER AND WHERE THERE IS NO LOCAL CIVIC SOCIETY IN THE LOCALITY, FOR THE GREATER MANCHESTER AREA AS A WHOLE. TO ENSURE THAT FUTURE DEVELOPMENT IS GOOD ENOUGH FOR MANCHESTER AND WHERE APPROPRIATE GREATER MANCHESTER, IN ACCORD WITH THE GREAT TRADITIONS OF THE AREA OF WHICH WE FOSTER A KEEN SENSE OF PRIDE FOR THE PLACE AND ITS PEOPLE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 14 November 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Speakman | Chair | 11 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Klimas | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT HARDMAN | Trustee | 31 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.12k | £1.31k | £1.00k | £1.84k | £1.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.60k | £410 | £461 | £395 | £685 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 February 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE. (2) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE. (3) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 CEMETERY ROAD
AUDENSHAW
MANCHESTER
M34 5AH
- Phone:
- 01614802224
- Email:
- info@manchestercivic.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window