CHURCHILL AND SARSDEN RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants in pursuance of religious training and education for children, young people and adults resident in the parish of Churchill with Sarsden.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 14 November 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREA RATCLIFFE | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Mary Claire Blackman | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|||||
RUPERT PONSONBY | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|||||
Thomas HEYWOOD-LONSDALE | Trustee | 05 November 2012 |
|
|||||
Rev DAVID WHITTON SALTER | Trustee | 31 October 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.57k | £6.56k | £6.65k | £6.87k | £7.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.07k | £2.02k | £2.01k | £1.18k | £1.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SECTION 2 ORDER 1973 EDUCATION ACT DATED 18 NOVEMBER 1991 AND AMENDED 30 JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES RELATED TO THE PARISH OF CHURCHILL AND SARSDEN IN CONNECTION WITH THE PROVISION OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BY MEANS OF A SUNDAY SCHOOL OR OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF CHURCHILL AND SARSDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stow Cottage
Junction Road
Churchill
Chipping Norton
OX7 6NP
- Phone:
- 07836 703126
- Email:
- tomhl@stowcott.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window