THE MCKENNA CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable objectives with particular reference to the relief of suffering of individuals with disabilities and children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 November 1995: Standard registration
- 16 February 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £146.09k | £272.46k | £30.00k | £50.02k | £63.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.92k | £13.79k | £122.42k | £207.13k | £124.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 28 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | 03 February 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 03 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | 03 February 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 19 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | 24 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 23 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | 05 November 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5TH MAY 1995.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE SAID SUM OF ú1 AND SUCH OTHER SUMS OR ASSETS AS MAY BE TRANSFERRED TO THEM HEREAFTER AND THE INVESTMENTS AND PROPERTY FROM TIME TO TIME REPRESENTING THE SAME (TOGETHER BEING CALLED THE TRUST FUND) AND THE INCOME THEREOF UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME AND THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF THE TRUST FUND TO SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE DEFINED IN SECTION 97 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME RESOLVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window