RJ AND AH DANIELS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1050703
Charity reporting is up to date (118 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Apply income or capital for the benefit of such charities as the trustees shall think fit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £181,585
Total expenditure: £226,996

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 November 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SG KLEINWORT HAMBROS TRUST COMPANY (UK) LIMITED Trustee 29 December 1994
THE RIVER TRUST
Received: 45 days late
STARKIE BENCE CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
THE MID MOSS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
C A RODEWALD CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £40.79k £32.35k £30.39k £161.69k £181.59k
Total expenditure £14.05k £66.00k £1.39k £241.14k £227.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 February 2025 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 February 2025 118 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 September 2024 329 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 September 2024 329 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 March 2022 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 March 2022 142 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 December 2020 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 December 2020 52 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
One Bank Street
London
E14 4SG
Phone:
0207 597 3392
Website:

No information available