VALLI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty of persons and the aged who are in need of care and attention because of the disabilities of old age by the provision of accommodation and other basic necessities of life as required and the advancement of religion according to the tenets of the Islamic faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 November 1995: Standard registration
- VALLI'S CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KHALID ADAM BA HONS | Trustee |
|
||||
FAIZAL SALLEH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.29k | £131.56k | £94.18k | £191.58k | £132.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £185.45k | £135.58k | £85.86k | £193.52k | £137.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 05 April 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 05 April 2024 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2021
(These accounts |
01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
(A)THE RELIEF OF THE AGED WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BECAUSE OF THE DISABILITIES OF THE OLD AGE BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION AND OTHER BASIC NECESSITIES OF LIFE AS REQUIRED.(B)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY ACCOMODATION AND OTHER NECESSITIES OF LIFE AS REQUIRED.(C)THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION ACCORDING TO THE TENETS OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MR AHMED DARIA
VALBRO BUSINESS PARK
BARKBY ROAD
LEICESTER
LE4 9LF
- Phone:
- 01162762276
- Email:
- khalid@aristocrate.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window