THE NAILSEA SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1050717
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2010
Total income: £111
Total expenditure: £8,174
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
- North Somerset
Governance
Registration history:
- 15 November 1995: Standard registration
- 05 January 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- NSA (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2006 | 31/07/2007 | 31/07/2008 | 31/07/2009 | 31/07/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.75k | £25.52k | £12.73k | £1.43k | £111 | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.29k | £21.44k | £20.78k | £3.61k | £8.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | 03 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | 05 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | 27 March 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | 02 April 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 24 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | 04 February 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | 08 May 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | 08 May 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window