Accounts and annual returns SUPPORT IN LEYLAND WITH EMERGENCY ACCOMMODATION FOR YOUNG PEOPLE

Charity Number: 1050738
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 November 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 January 2018 On Time