THE L A P S LOOKING AFTER PARENTS AND SIBLINGS GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LAPS offers support to mothers and their families who have lost a baby. We are sponsoring 2 bereaved parents to attend the sands counselling programme in order for them to start agroup within our local area. A yearly memorial service is also held for families who wish to attend, we also conduct a christmas tree service in the baby garden within the cemetary. We provide sensitive paperwork for the
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 16 November 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirsty Malcolm | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Craig Fullard | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Cooper | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alana Butler | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Murray | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kim Roden | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE ANNE SADLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.68k | £4.49k | £0 | £1.01k | £5.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £772 | £1.03k | £2.67k | £3.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE DEATH OF A BABY AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1.THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING TO BEREAVED INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES. 2.THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FOR INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE OR WISH TO BECOME BEREAVEMENT COUNSELLORS. 3.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BEREAVEMENT AND BEREAVEMENT COUNSELLING.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WOLVERHAMPTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 ORCHARD ROAD
SHIFNAL
TF11 8EX
- Phone:
- 07949149757
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window