UNITED KINGDOM SPORTS ASSOCIATION FOR PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITY

Charity number: 1050767
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Leading UK national disability sport organisation for people with intellectual impairment. Promotes, facilitates & supports talented athletes to train,compete & excel in national/international sport. Supports National Governing Bodies of sport,influences policy, manages classification & supports GB athletes in/out competition. Member, British Paralympic Ass & GB member of Virtus

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £10,645
Total expenditure: £15,926

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Amateur Sport
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 November 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • Sport Excel UK (Working name)
  • UK SPORTS (Working name)
  • UK SPORTS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
  • UKSA UKSAPLD (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Genevieve Gordon Chair 06 April 2017
None on record
Lynne Glen Trustee 28 November 2022
None on record
Andrew Heffer Trustee 20 August 2020
None on record
Fiona Reid Trustee 11 December 2019
None on record
Gary Fraser Trustee 11 December 2019
None on record
Gavin Macleod Trustee 13 December 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £31.97k £32.82k £15.63k £13.59k £10.65k
Total expenditure £33.13k £31.69k £13.84k £11.75k £15.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SportExcel UK
PO Box 1467
Enfield
Middlesex
EN1 9PT
Phone:
02036336460