AYLESHAM AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY WORKSHOP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Charitable Business and our activities include: Providing community, training and business facilities. We have a range of training, conferencing, industrial units, office and recreational spaces available to rent. Supporting community services and groups from the local area including the former mining villages of Dover and Canterbury.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,242 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 17 November 1995: Standard registration
- AYLESHAM COMMUNITY PROJECT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Bott | Chair | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carys Williams | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shehrazade Maria Saraiva Mamjan | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Edward Flaig | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Carol Duffield | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nicholas Ratcliffe | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
JAMES IDWAL DAVIES | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|||||
Theti Angelika Doggett | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £307.00k | £226.30k | £262.32k | £285.19k | £298.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £300.00k | £308.23k | £317.69k | £285.65k | £310.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 | £3.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16TH OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN THE AYLESHAM AND RURAL DISTRICT TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Area of benefit
AYLESHAM AND RURAL DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
ACKHOLT ROAD
AYLESHAM
CANTERBURY
KENT
CT3 3AJ
- Phone:
- 01304842826
- Email:
- info@aylesham.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window