MRS H R GREENE CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations to organisations and individuals in accordance with what the Trustees believe Mrs Greene would have wished for such charitable purposes as they shall from time to time think proper including in particular to benefit the Parish of Wistanstow and its inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
- Shropshire
Governance
- 17 November 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hugh Charles Scott | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
MR J BOSTON | Trustee | 23 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR C BOSTON | Trustee | 23 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.50k | £76.58k | £94.09k | £95.18k | £93.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.72k | £80.74k | £75.23k | £142.39k | £86.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 16 DECEMBER 1945
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES INCLUDING A.THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WISTANSTOW BY THE PROVISION OF ELECTRICITY OR WATER OR OTHER SUPPLIES OR AMENITIES. B.THE MAINTENANCE REPAIR OR IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF WISTANSTOW AND THE PROVISION,MAINTENANCE REPAIR OR IMPROVEMENT OF ANY ADDITIONS TO SUCH FABRIC OR ANY BELLS,ORGAN WINDOWS OR FURNITURE IN THE SAID CHURCH.C THE MAINTENANCE REPAIR OR IMPROVEMENT OF AND THE PROVISION OF ANY ADDITIONS TO THE VILLAGE HALL AND THE CARETAKERS AND NURSES COTTAGES CONNECTED THEREWITH. D THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF PENSIONS OR SINGLE OR OTHER PAYMENTS OR BENEFITS FOR THE INHABITANTS OF WISTANSTOW OR FORMER EMPLOYEES OR TENANTS OF MRS GREENE OR ACTUALLY OR FORMERLY RESIDENTS ON OR CONNECTED WITH THE GROVE ESTATE OR FOR THE WIDOWS WIDOWERS OR DEPENDANTS OF ANY SUCH PERSONS WHO IN EACH CASE MAY BE IN POVERTY AND NEED OF ASSISTANCE. E. THE EDUCATION OF ANY SUCH ISSUES OR DEPENDANTS AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BIRKETTS LLP
KINGFISHER HOUSE
1 GILDERS WAY
NORWICH
NR3 1UB
- Phone:
- 01603232300
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window