THE FRIENDS OF EAST HADDON SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various fund raising activites including jumble sales, Christmas Fayre, May Day Fete, games evenings, bingo evenings, craft mornings to raise money for items which cannot be afforded from the school budget. Also social evenings for parents and staff to get to know each other.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 22 November 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Jane Murthwaite-Price | Chair | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phoebe Victoria Lowick | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Widdowson-Fuller | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MRS C TRUSLOVE | Trustee | 17 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.37k | £4.33k | £6.57k | £6.25k | £4.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.61k | £5.72k | £2.78k | £3.33k | £9.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 12TH OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
EAST HADDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
EAST HADDON C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
CHURCH LANE
EAST HADDON
NORTHAMPTON
NN6 8DB
- Phone:
- 01604770462
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window