THE BLESSED ROBERT JOHNSON PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1050819
Charity reporting is overdue by 1783 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To hold fundraising events in order to purchase items for the school members with regards to art/culture/sport.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2008

Total income: £53
Total expenditure: £4,735

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Telford & Wrekin

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 November 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS PAM GREAVES Trustee
None on record
GABRIELLE KENDRICK Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2004 31/08/2005 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008
Total gross income £5.43k £1.79k £1.57k £1.19k £53
Total expenditure £1.90k £1.62k £1.63k £4.46k £4.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 688 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 688 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1053 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1053 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1418 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1418 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1783 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1783 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 ASHBROOK COURT
CHURCH STRETTON
SY6 6EW
Phone:
01694724969
Website:

No information available