Accounts and annual returns KIRKBYMOORSIDE CP SCHOOL ACCOUNT

Charity number: 1050822
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 February 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required