ADAPT (HOUSING)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Housing for disabled and those in housing need Independent living
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 18 November 1995: Standard registration
- 05 April 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2008 | 31/10/2009 | 31/10/2010 | 31/10/2011 | 31/10/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.68k | £376 | £67 | £67 | £96 | |
|
Total expenditure | £30 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £10.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2012 | 07 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2011 | 06 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2010 | 14 February 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | 08 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
1.THE RELIEF OF DISABLED AND PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION AND OTHER ASSOCIATED AMENITIES, ESPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS AND BY BRINGING SUCH PERSONS INTO CLOSER ASSOCIATION WITH ABLE BODIED PERSONS. 2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR NEEDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window