Accounts and annual returns SWANSEA NHS TRUST ENDOWMENT FUNDS

Charity number: 1050866
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 08 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 08 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 03 April 2008 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 03 April 2008 63 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 05 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 17 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 17 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 29 December 2005 On Time