WEY VALLEY ADVANCED MOTORCYCLISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Road Safety Organisation - providing guidance to motorcyclists to prepare them for The Institute of Advanced Motorists - Advanced Motorcycle Test
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
76 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 November 1995: Standard registration
- WVAM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clive Rattenbury | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
gary finch | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Tanousis | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Achuthanunni Chokkathukalam Balakrishnan | Trustee | 18 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Varley | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Matthew Kett | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mellor | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANET JONES | Trustee | 09 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Llewellyn Caddick JCD, MBA | Trustee | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BRADDICK | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.69k | £17.52k | £17.72k | £18.13k | £20.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.37k | £12.03k | £24.20k | £22.51k | £22.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 17 MAY 1993 as amended on 17 May 2023
Charitable objects
PROVIDING ROAD SAFETY AND ADVANCED MOTORING INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE LONDON AND SOUTH EAST COUNTIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Luxford Way
BILLINGSHURST
West Sussex
RH14 9PA
- Phone:
- 07773228181
- Email:
- secretary@wvam.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window