Financial history THE PROVEN FAMILY TRUST

Charity Number: 1050877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £41.33k £31.73k £36.86k £40.85k £38.21k
Total expenditure £38.70k £32.90k £38.86k £34.35k £25.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A