Financial history LITTLE WILLOWS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1050897
Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £77.82k £70.46k £100.23k £107.15k £105.56k
Total expenditure £80.06k £69.78k £77.73k £107.59k £130.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £49.17k £46.75k £72.24k £67.14k £65.43k