LITTLE WILLOWS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Little Willows has been providing childcare and early years education for the village and surrounding areas since 1995. Today Little Willows is a thriving group offering places for 2.5 to 5 year olds everyday in term time. Little Willows is a registered educational charity and is run by a committee of parents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £65,430 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 21 November 1995: Standard registration
- WALSHAM LE WILLOWS PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Louise Bryant | Chair | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Violet Helen Bullett | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Louise Mullen | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tom Guest | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Watson | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Lee-Ann Sheridan | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Louise Webster | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Paxton | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.82k | £70.46k | £100.23k | £107.15k | £105.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.06k | £69.78k | £77.73k | £107.59k | £130.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £49.17k | £46.75k | £72.24k | £67.14k | £65.43k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 November 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 November 2023 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH OCTOBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 03 DEC 2019
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
WALSHAM LE WILLOWS AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Little Willows Preschool
Wattisfield Road
Walsham-Le-Willows
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
Suffolk
IP31 3BD
- Phone:
- 01359250734
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window