Trustees LITTLE WILLOWS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1050897
Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Louise Bryant Chair 30 September 2024
None on record
Abigail Violet Helen Bullett Trustee 23 September 2024
None on record
Alice Louise Mullen Trustee 23 September 2024
None on record
Tom Guest Trustee 15 April 2024
None on record
Laura Jane Watson Trustee 17 March 2024
None on record
Vicky Lee-Ann Sheridan Trustee 31 July 2023
None on record
Karen Louise Webster Trustee 05 September 2022
None on record
Lauren Paxton Trustee 25 September 2020
None on record