Accounts and annual returns GRENVILLE NURSERY

Charity number: 1050902
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2010 26 May 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 13 June 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2009 01 July 2010 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 12 July 2010 12 days late
Annual return 31 August 2008 02 July 2009 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 13 July 2009 13 days late