GRENVILLE NURSERY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide quality childcare in a safe and happy environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 21 November 1995: Standard registration
- 27 July 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ST RUMBOLD'S PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- ST RUMBOLD'S PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.04k | £58.79k | £63.76k | £60.03k | £63.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.16k | £53.30k | £58.12k | £64.95k | £66.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 26 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 13 June 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 01 July 2010 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 12 July 2010 | 12 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 02 July 2009 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 13 July 2009 | 13 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 SEPTEMBER 1995, AS AMENDED 5 JULY 2005 AND 5 JULY 2006 AND BY ORDER DATED 30 JANUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
BUCKINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window